+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor