+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2016: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .SJR16-003
January 28, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SJR16-003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor