+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2017 - No Amendments
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2017 - No Amendments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to