+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor