+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/27/2015 - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2015 - No Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy