+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2016: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .SJM16-002
January 21, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SJM16-002
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor