+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations