+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-097 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor