+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Finance
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Finance