+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor