+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2016: House Judiciary: . .SB16-088
February 16, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .SB16-088
February 16, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .SB16-088
February 16, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .SB16-088
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor