+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor