+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
May 9, 2016: House Appropriations: . .SB16-087
May 5, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-087
May 5, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-087
April 29, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-087
April 29, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-087
April 29, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-087
April 29, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-087
February 11, 2016: Senate Transportation: . .SB16-087
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor