+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor