+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2016 - No Amendments
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .SB16-080
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .SB16-080
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .SB16-080
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .SB16-080
February 16, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-080
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor