+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2015 - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy