+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs