+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Lay Over Amended
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government