+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs