+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 4, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-074
April 4, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-074
February 26, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-074
February 26, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-074
February 16, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-074
February 10, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-074
February 10, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-074
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor