+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs