+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services