+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs