+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - RECONSIDER SB13-007 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.005 The motion passed without objection.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection.
March 14, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
March 14, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
MORSE
Type:
Primary Sponsor