+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2015 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor