+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/27/2018 - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2018 - No Amendments
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2018 - No Amendments
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Amended
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary