+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor