+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
On April 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments
On April 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2024 - No Amendments
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/18/2024 - No Amendments
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/11/2024 - No Amendments
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs