+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
- Senate Third Reading Passed
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-060 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor