+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Amended
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor