+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
March 13, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor