+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .SB16-058
March 24, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .SB16-058
March 4, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-058
March 4, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
February 17, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-058
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor