+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education