+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 19, 2014: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection.
March 19, 2014: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor