+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 25, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
On January 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs