+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services