+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations