+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs