+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-052 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor