+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary