+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary