+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education