+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation