+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor