+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2018 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor