+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Finance
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2015 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Votes (12)
April 27, 2015: House Education: . .SB15-045
April 27, 2015: House Education: . .SB15-045
March 13, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-045
February 10, 2015: Senate Finance: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
February 5, 2015: Senate Education: . .SB15-045
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor