+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology