+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2018 - No Amendments
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2018 - No Amendments
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2018 - No Amendments
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2018 - No Amendments
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2018 - No Amendments
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor