+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor