+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
March 6, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 12-0.
January 31, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Motion to COW and consent calendar. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor